Gogos v. AMS-Mechanical System, Inc.

Defendant: AMS-Mechanical System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthimos Gogos
Case Number: 1:2013cv03779
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/11/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
August 22, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/22/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
March 31, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/31/2014. Mailed notice(vcf, )
May 29, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/29/2014. To begin with, AMS's counsel have labeled this as a "Defense" (not an AD):The complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. If counsel is seri ous about that, the proper procedure is not to have that contention lie dormant -- instead a Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) motion must be filed together with a supporting memorandum, and the motion must be noticed up for presentment. Accordingly that & quot;Defense" is stricken without prejudice. As for the AD, which asserts a possible failure on Gogos' part to mitigate his damages, obviously neither AMS nor its counsel knows that such is the case (the AD's "to the extent" locution tips that off). If discovery were to reveal an actual failure to mitigate damages, an AD on that score may then be advanced -- but for the present the AD is also stricken. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gogos v. AMS-Mechanical System, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMS-Mechanical System, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthimos Gogos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]