Doxy v. Harrington

Respondent: Rick Harrington
Petitioner: Rodrick Doxy
Case Number: 1:2013cv06842
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 11/13/2013. Mailed notice(mjc, )
November 19, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENT TO MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 11/19/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
September 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/30/2013.(mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doxy v. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodrick Doxy
Represented By: James S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.