Leib et al v. Rex Energy Operating Corp.

Case Number: 3:2006cv00802
Filed: October 17, 2006
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Clifford J. Proud
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/dka) in favor of Julia Leib, Lisa Thompson against PENNTEX Resources Illinois, Inc., Rex Energy Operating Corp.Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/26/2010. (dka, )
December 19, 2008 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION that plaintiff is to submit a revised class definition consistent with this Order. The Court reserves ruling on Motion for Class Certification 62 until that time. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/19/08. (dka, )
February 26, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting Motion for Class Certification and certifying class (see order for specifics). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 02/26/09. (msd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leib et al v. Rex Energy Operating Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]