Conner et al v. Ford Motor Company

Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Pam Conner and Frank Muegge
ThirdParty Defendant: Timothy J. Swindell
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
 
Case Number: 3:2007cv00122
Filed: February 14, 2007
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: David R Herndon
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2009 177 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE due to 171 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 06/04/09. (seg)
June 12, 2009 188 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 185 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Visteon. Defendant Visteon Coroporation is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this action, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2). ORDER GRANTING 187 Plaintiffs' Amended Mot ion to Lift Stay of Bankruptcy. Accordingly, the Court hereby LIFTS the Stay entered in this case. ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 178 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Visteon and Johnson Controls without Prejudice, and 179 Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 06/12/2009. (seg)
June 30, 2009 194 Featured Case STRICKEN - ORDER granting 117 Third Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6-30-2009. (djm) Modified on 7/6/2009 (myz ).
July 6, 2009 197 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING summary judgment to Third Party Defendant Timothy J. Swindell re 118 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timothy J. Swindell, 117 Third Party MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy J. Swindell. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/6/2009. (djm)
February 16, 2011 231 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 229 Motion for Summary Judgment by Johnson Controls, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/16/11. (bjw)
February 23, 2011 232 Featured Case ORDER directing Defendant to file its Rule 7.1 corporate-disclosure statement within ten days. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/23/11. (bjw)
February 14, 2012 247 Featured Case ORDER granting 246 Motion To Voluntarily Dismiss Claim of Pam Conner Without Prejudice Pursuant To Rule 41(a)(2) filed by Frank Muegge, Pam Conner. Plaintiff Pam Conner terminated as a party.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/13/2012. (mtm)
May 27, 2012 293 Featured Case FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/27/2012. (mtm)
May 29, 2012 294 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 267 Motion to Enlarge Peremptory Challenges or, in the Alternative, to Reduce Venire.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/29/2012. (mtm)
June 11, 2012 317 Featured Case 60 DAY ORDER advising that has has settled. Responses due by 8/13/2012. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/11/12. (skp)
August 1, 2012 319 Featured Case ORDER granting 318 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/1/2012. (mtm)
February 15, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William D. Stiehl recused. Case reassigned to Judge David R. Herndon for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 02/15/07. (jkb)
September 5, 2008 99 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 24 Amended Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint and DENYING 61 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, filed by third-party defendant Swindell. Signed by Chief Judge David R Herndon on 09/05/2008. (seg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Conner et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Joseph P. Whyte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Conner
Represented By: Jon E. Rosenstengel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Muegge
Represented By: Jon E. Rosenstengel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Timothy J. Swindell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Joseph P. Whyte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]