Taropff v. United States of America

Plaintiff: John A. Taropff
Defendant: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00411
Filed: May 29, 2009
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Clifford J. Proud
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 28 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/10/11. (bjw)
March 10, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING in part and DEFERRING in part 34 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/10/11. (bjw)
March 10, 2011 43 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 35 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/10/11. (bjw)
March 10, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING in part, DENYING in part, and DEFERRING in part 38 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/10/11. (bjw)
April 13, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 56 Motion for Order to Hold Motion for Costs and Attorney's Fees in Abeyance and Setting a Response Deadline of 14 Days After Determination of the United States' Forthcoming Rule 50 and Rule 59 Motions. Defendant's 61 Motion for Extension of Time is terminated as moot. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/13/11. (bjw)
February 15, 2012 72 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 64 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; DENYING 64 Motion for New Trial; GRANTING 70 Motion for Leave to File Supplement. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/15/12. (bjw)
March 29, 2012 76 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 55 MOTION for Judgment on the Jury's Verdict and Award Fees and Costs and Combined Supporting Brief filed by John A. Tarpoff, ORDER granting 74 MOTION for Order to Establish a Due Date for the United States&# 039; Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs filed by United States of America. The Court grants plaintiff's motion for judgment on the jury's verdict. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly. However, the Court defers its decision as to plaintiff's entitlement to costs pending receipt of plaintiff's supplemental materials and the government's response. Plaintiff shall supplement its motion for attorney's fees by April 11, 2012. The government shall respond to plaintiff's supplemented motion by April 25, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/28/2012. (mtm)
June 20, 2012 86 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 and 83 Motion to Award Fees and Costs. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/19/2012. (mtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Taropff v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Taropff
Represented By: Mark Albert Bradford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]