Newbern v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Jamell C. Newbern
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00064
Filed: January 27, 2010
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Bond
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 26, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice for being untimely. The motion for hearing is denied as moot. No certificate of appealability shall be issued in this case. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in this case. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 12/26/2012. (msdi)
June 24, 2010 2 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Directing the Government to respond to Petitioner's Section 2255 motion. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/24/2010. (jwt)
July 15, 2010 4 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by United States of America. Response due August 20, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/15/10. (anj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Newbern v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Ranley R. Killian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamell C. Newbern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]