Greenville IL et al v. Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: City of Greenville IL, Village of Coulterville, Illinois, Village of Evansville, Illinois, Village of Farina, Illinois, City of Gillespie, Illinois, City of Cameron, Missouri, City of Concordia, Missouri, City of Carbondale, Kansas, City of Dodge City, Kansas, City of Marion, Kansas, Miami County Rural Water District No. 2, City of Oswego, Kansas, City of Plains, Kansas, City of Jasper, Indiana, Village of Monroeville, Ohio, City of Upper Sandusky, Ohio and City of Creston, Iowa
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc. and Syngenta AG
Case Number: 3:2010cv00188
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc. The Court grants the motion to dismiss to the extent it seeks to dismiss the claims in Count III brought by plaintiffs, City of J asper, Indiana, and Indiana-American Water Company. The Court dismisses those claims with prejudice. The Court denies the motion in all other respects. Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at close of case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/18/2010. (dka, )
December 21, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE granting 116 SEALED MOTION to Substitute Brief, denying as moot 114 SEALED MOTION to strike declarations. Plaintiff ordered to show cause why their Motion to Strike [114} and Exhibits 115 should not be unsealed. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/21/2010. (dka, )
July 18, 2011 200 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDERdismissing without prejudice City of Dodge City, Kansas and City of Plains, Kansas. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/18/2011. (dka, )
July 21, 2011 202 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to unseal Documents 114, 116, 121, 127, 128 and 134; granting 159 MOTION to Intervene filed by Prairie Rivers Network, Environmental Law and Policy Center but orders that the intervenors shall not b e allowed access to sealed documents on the Court's Electronic Case Filing system. The Court REFERS the intervenors motion to vacate the protective order (Doc. 165) to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, who entered the original order. See order for additional specifics. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/21/2011. (dka, )
September 14, 2011 228 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 206 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/14/2011. (dka, )
September 16, 2011 231 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 216 First MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Prairie Rivers Network, Environmental Law and Policy Center; overruling 225 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Environmental Law and Policy Center, Prairie Rivers Network re 220 Order on Motion to Vacate filed by Prairie Rivers Network, Environmental Law and Policy Center. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/16/2011. (dka, )
November 4, 2011 250 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 247 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal filed by Prairie Rivers Network, Environmental Law and Policy Center The Court ORDERS that the time to file a notice of appeal is extended to October 20, 2011, the date the new notice of appeal was filed. The new notice is therefore timely. The Court dismisses 238 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Prairie Rivers Network, Environmental Law and Policy Center. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/4/2011. (dka, )
November 23, 2011 255 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 121 Motion to Strike and denying 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/22/2011. (dka, )
May 30, 2012 297 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 294 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/30/2012. (dka, )
September 13, 2012 320 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 316 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph D Palmer and directing Clerk of Court to terminate Public Water Supply District 1 of Clinton County, Missouri, and Nocona Water Department as objectors and to termina te Palmer as their counsel. Pursuant to Administrative Order 116, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to refund Palmers $100 pro hac vice admission fee to the credit card from which the payment was made.The Court denies 319 MOTION Expedited Discovery and quashes any discovery the plaintiffs have served on Palmer, Public Water Supply District 1 of Clinton County, Missouri, or Nocona Water Department. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/13/2012. (dka, )
October 23, 2012 325 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 308 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and 321 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement. See Order for specifics. Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/23/2012. (dka, )
October 23, 2012 326 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/dka). See judgment for specifics.Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/23/2012. (dka, )
December 4, 2012 330 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 251 Motion for Order to Maintain Confidentiality; granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion to Unseal Documents. Defendants shall refile certain exhibits supporting Doc. No. 112 in redacted form. Absent further order, Document No. 112 and certain exhibits to be unsealed by the Clerk on 12/27/2012. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 12/4/2012. (kls)
March 19, 2013 350 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER affirming Magistrate Judge Frazier's December 4, 2012, order 330 , overruling defendants' objections to that order 332 . The Court orders the plaintiffs to electronically refile on April 19, 2013, Exhibits 298, 329, 346, 348, and 357-60 to the plaintiffs response to Syngenta AGs motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Doc. 112) without placing them under seal; and Directs the Clerk of Court to enter final judgment as to the sealing issue accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/19/2013. (dka, )
March 19, 2013 351 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REGARDING SEALED DOCUMENTS (NJR/dka).Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/19/2013. (dka, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenville IL et al v. Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Greenville IL
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Coulterville, Illinois
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Evansville, Illinois
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Farina, Illinois
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Gillespie, Illinois
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Cameron, Missouri
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Concordia, Missouri
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Carbondale, Kansas
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Dodge City, Kansas
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Marion, Kansas
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami County Rural Water District No. 2
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Oswego, Kansas
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Plains, Kansas
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Jasper, Indiana
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Monroeville, Ohio
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Upper Sandusky, Ohio
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Creston, Iowa
Represented By: Christie R. Deaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]