Johnson v. University of Illinois

Plaintiff: Linda K. Johnson
Defendant: University of Illinois
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00274
Filed: April 14, 2010
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Clinton
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 1:102
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDER, DENYING 13 "Motion to Reinstate Case on Docket" filed by Linda K. Johnson. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 8/23/2011. (mmr)
August 24, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER, DENYING 13 Motion to Reinstate Case on Docket. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 8/23/2011. (mmr )
September 27, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER, DENYING 17 MOTION to Reinstate filed by Linda K. Johnson.Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/27/2012. (mmr)
May 12, 2010 5 Featured Case ORDER denying 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and 4 motion for service of process at government expense. Johnson has until June 16, 2010 to to pay the filing fee to the Clerk of Court or her case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 5/12/2010. (pjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Johnson v. University of Illinois
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda K. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Illinois
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]