Hassebrock v. Bernhoft et al

Plaintiff: Orvil Duane Hassebrock
Defendant: Robert G. Bernhoft and The Bernhoft Law Firm, SC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00679
Filed: September 2, 2010
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Marion
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: William D. Stiehl
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion to Quash; granting 111 Motion to Compel; denying 119 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 04/16/2014. (jdp)
May 2, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/2/2014. (jdh)
May 15, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 106 Motion to Vacate ; DENYING 120 Motion for Disclosure; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 122 Motion to Compel; GRANTING 129 Motion to Compel; DENYING 131 Motion for Sanctions; DENYING 133 Motion ; DENYIN G AS MOOT 134 Motion to Compel; DENYING 135 Motion to Stay; DENYING AS MOOT 144 Motion to Clarify; GRANTING 148 Motion to Compel; DENYING 154 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/15/14. (sgp)
February 6, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion for Extension of Time, DENYING 7 Motion for Default Judgment, DENYING 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff has 21 DAYS to properly serve defendants. (Service due by 2/27/2012.) The Clerk's 6 entry of default is SET ASIDE. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 2/6/2012. (bjw)
February 25, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, GRANTING 34 Second Motion to Amend Complaint, DENYING 33 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due by 3/27/2013. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 2/25/2013. (bjw)
May 13, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 58 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 5/13/2013. (bjw)
June 19, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 53 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/19/13. (sgp)
August 5, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a jurisdictional supplement by August 19, 2013, properly pleading diversity jurisdiction as discussed in this order. The final pretrial conference is rescheduled for November 18, 2013, at 10:30 a.m., and the presumptive trial month is rescheduled for December 2013, in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge William D. Stiehl. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 8/5/2013. (bjw)
September 17, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion to Quash; denying 82 Motion to Stay. Defendant Barnes SHALL file a responsive pleading by October 6, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/17/2013. (jdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassebrock v. Bernhoft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orvil Duane Hassebrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Bernhoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bernhoft Law Firm, SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.