Robinson et al v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Willie Robinson, Flazell Redfield, Richard Ross, Tommy Turner and Willie Brooks
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv01046
Filed: December 29, 2010
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing BNSF Railway Company to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. ( Action due by 2/11/2011.). Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/1/2011. (msdi, )
April 30, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court 60 DAY ORDER advising that case has settled. Responses due by 7/2/2012. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/30/12. (skp)
September 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER acknowledging 28 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Willie Robinson, Willie Brooks, Flazell Redfield, Richard Ross, and BNSF Railway Company. Willie Robinson, Richard Ross, Willie Brooks, and Flazell Redfield terminated. The "60 Day Order" 27 is vacated. (Plaintiff Tommy Turner is ordered to file a Status Report by 11/5/2012.). Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/5/2012. (msdi)
December 26, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court 60 DAY ORDER: Responses due by 2/28/2013. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 12/26/2012. (msdi)
January 31, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Acknowledging parties' joint notice of dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 1/31/2013. (kar)
February 1, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/1/2013. (slj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robinson et al v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Robinson
Represented By: Kevin A. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flazell Redfield
Represented By: Kevin A. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ross
Represented By: Kevin A. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Turner
Represented By: Kevin A. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Brooks
Represented By: Kevin A. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: William A. Brasher
Represented By: Linda R. Self
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]