Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Osterhage Contracting Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund and Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Osterhage Contracting Incorporated and Debra Osterhage
Case Number: 3:2011cv00521
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiffs to file supplement to motion for default judgment. Supplement due November 2, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 10/19/2011. (klh, )
November 4, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Default Judgment and ORDER granting 10 Motion for Default Judgment and granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 11/3/11. (klh, )
February 16, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion Turn Over Assets Based Upon Answer to Third Party Citation by Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund, Employers & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/16/12. (klh, )
December 3, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion To Turn Over Assets. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 12/3/12. (klh, )
August 29, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion motion to turn over assets held at State Bank of Waterloo. See Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/29/13. (klh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Osterhage Contracting Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund
Represented By: Britt W. Sowle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Britt W. Sowle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osterhage Contracting Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Osterhage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]