Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Boyd et al

Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Gary Boyd, Jacqueline J Boyd, Current Spouse or Civil Union partner, if any, of Gary Boyd, Current Spouse or Civil Union partner,if any, of Jacqueline J Boyd, USA and Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00714
Filed: June 15, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER,For the foregoing reasons, the Court DISMISSES the claim involving the United States with prejudice, DISMISSES the claims involving the remaining defendants without prejudice, and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. The motion for summary judgment (Doc. 22 ) is DENIED as moot in light of this ruling and as failing to carry the burden of proving entitlement to judgment as a matter of law (Doc. 22). (jdh)
June 6, 2013 29 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/jdh) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the claims of the plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of Argent Securities, Inc., Asset Backed Pass Through Certificates, Series 2003-W5, Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated as of October 1, 2003, against the defendant United States of America are dismissed with prejudice; andIT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the claims of the plaintiff DeutscheBank National Trust Company, as Trustee o f Argent Securities, Inc., Asset Backed Pass Through Certificates, Series 2003-W5, Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated as of October 1, 2003, against the defendants Gary Boyd, Jacqueline J. Boyd, Current Spouse or Civil Union Partner, if any, of Gary Boyd, Current Spouse or Civil Union Partner, if any, of Jacqueline J.Boyd, and Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants are dismissed without prejudice.Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/6/2013. (jdh)
July 31, 2013 34 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, GRANTING motion to vacate the judgment in this case (Doc. 31 ); VACATES the judgment (Doc. 29 ) and REINSTATES this case;ORDERS Deutsche Bank to SHOW CAUSE, why its claims as to the unserved defendants should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) for failure to serve process in a timely manner; and ORDERS that a Final Pretrial Conference is set for September 13, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. and a Bench Trial is set for September 23, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/31/2013. (jdh)
August 20, 2013 36 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Court DISCHARGES the order to show cause as it relates to defendants Gary Boyd and Jacqueline J. Boyd, DISMISSES the claims as to the Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m), and DIRECT S the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to VACATE docket entry 26 and to docket the proper June 6, 2013, Memorandum and Order using the original signature date. The Court RESERVES RULING on the request to reconsider the denial of Deutsche Banks summary judgment motion Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/20/2013. (jdh)
August 30, 2013 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court finds that the claim involving the United States is action is DISMISSED with prejudice and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. the Court GRANTS Deutsche Banks motion to remand this case to state c ourt (Doc. 40 ). The Court further: FINDS pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) that there is no just reason for delay in entry of judgment on the claim involving the United States;the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter a Rule 54( b) judgment dismissing the claims involving the United States and the Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants; and REMANDS the remainder of this case to the Circuit Court of the Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/30/2013. (jdh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Boyd et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: David C. Kluever
Represented By: Jason D. Altman
Represented By: Susan J. Notarius
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline J Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Current Spouse or Civil Union partner, if any, of Gary Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Current Spouse or Civil Union partner,if any, of Jacqueline J Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: J. Christopher Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]