Malone v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: William A Malone
Defendant: Randy Davis and Whitehead
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00126
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 1 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/6/2013. (tjk)
November 14, 2013 22 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court STAYS this case pending further order of the Court; ORDERS that Malone shall have up to and including December 6, 2013, to pay the entire balance due of the initial partial filing fee of $82.27; WARNS Malone that if he does not pay the entire balance due of the initial partial filing fee of $82.27 by December 6, 2013, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice for failure to comply with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1); andDENIES as moot Malones motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 13) in light of the Courts order granting him pauper status (Doc. 12). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/14/2013. (jdh)
January 22, 2014 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER,The Court DISMISSES this case without prejudice for failure to comply with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1) and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/21/2014. (jdh)
March 25, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, granting 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William A Malone.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants DAVIS and WHITEHEAD: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/25/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malone v. Davis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Malone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitehead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]