Reed v. Unum Provident et al

Plaintiff: Darrell D. Reed
Defendant: Unum Provident and Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 3:2013cv00171
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court 60 DAY ORDER advising case has settled. Responses due by 1/2/2014. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 10/29/2013. (slj)
November 12, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 11/12/2013. (kbl)
November 13, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 11/12/2013. (slj)
April 3, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/3/2013. (kar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Unum Provident et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Provident
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.