Spring v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Duane R Spring
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00236
Filed: March 11, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Clifford J. Proud
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Joint MOTION to Remand under the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. section 405(g) filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Joint stipulation is GRANTED. Case is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner for rehearing and reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/8/2013. (kar)
July 9, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff, Duane R. Spring and against defendant, Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/8/2013. (slj)
April 4, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/4/2013. (kar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Spring v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jennifer D.L. Hudson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane R Spring
Represented By: Richard D. Murray, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]