Godfrey v. Harrington et al

Plaintiff: Toby Godfrey
Defendant: Richard Harrington, Unknown Party, Sergeant Heiman and Sergeant Eladvor
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00280
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson, Granting 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Toby Godfrey, Denying 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Toby Godfrey. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to prepare for De fendants RICHARD HARRINGTON, SERGEANT HEIMAN and SERGEANT ELADVOR: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). See attached order for further details. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 5/31/2013. (tjk)
September 12, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 18 Motion to Amend/Correct; DENYING 19 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel ; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 20 Motion to Produce; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 21 Motion to Amend/Correct; DENYING 22 Motion ; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 23 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/12/13. (sgp)
November 5, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER re 4 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and initial filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/5/13. (sgp)
December 13, 2013 50 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court hereby ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 31 );DENIES Godfreys motion for a TRO and PI with prejudice in part and without prejudice in part (Doc. 24 ). The motion is denied with prejudice to the extent it seeks a TRO and without prejudice to the extent it seeks a PI; and DENIES Godfreys motion for default judgment (Doc. 29 ). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/13/2013. (jdh)
April 11, 2013 6 Featured Case IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice, and with leave to amend. Defendants S.A. GODINEZ, RICHARD HARRINGTON, KIMBERLY BUTLER and GAIL WALLS are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Plaintiff is ADVISED that this dis missal shall not count as one of his allotted "strikes" under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should Plaintiff wish to proceed, he shall file his First Amended Complaint, within 30 days of the entry of this order. Failure to timely file an amended complaint shall result in the dismissal of the action becoming dismissal with prejudice. (Action due by 5/13/2013). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 4/11/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Godfrey v. Harrington et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Godfrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Heiman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Eladvor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]