Hill v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Gerald Hill
Defendant: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00307
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Bond
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Denying 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/7/2013. (jdh)
February 21, 2014 33 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. The Court grants 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/21/14. (jdh)
February 27, 2014 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 36 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by Gerald Hill.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/27/2014. (jdh)
April 22, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, granting 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Hill. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to complete, on Plaintiff's behalf, a summons for service of process on the United States; the Clerk shall issue the completed summons. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/22/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hill v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Hill
Represented By: Charles E. Kirksey, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]