Ledbetter v. Good Samaritan Ministries et al

Defendant: Bobby Anderson, Good Samaritan Ministries and Michael Heath
Plaintiff: Linzie J. Ledbetter
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00308
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 29 Motion to Strike ; denying 24 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/6/2013. (anj)
February 18, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER providing pro se plaintiff Ledbetter notice re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Anderson, Michael Heath, Good Samaritan Ministries. In light of this notice, The Court ALLOWS plaintiff Ledbetter up to and including Mar ch 4, 2014, to respond to the pending motion for summaryjudgment with any additional materials he feels are relevant and necessary to the dispute.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/18/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fed. R. Civ. P. 56)(mtm)
July 17, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, granting 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Anderson, Michael Heath, Good Samaritan Ministries.Plaintiff Linzie J. Ledbetter's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly.This file is closed. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/17/2014. (mtm)
July 17, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/17/14. (cekf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ledbetter v. Good Samaritan Ministries et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Samaritan Ministries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Heath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linzie J. Ledbetter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]