Baird v. Hodge, et al

Defendant: Sandy Burke, Nurse Darnold, Michael R. Maus, Jeffrey Strubhart, Officer Harper, Lt Stafford, Treadway and Marcus Hodge
Plaintiff: Willis Baird
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00376
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Willis Baird, 12 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Willis Baird. COUNTS 5 and 6 are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Defendan ts MUSGRAVE, BROWN, CARIE, JOHN DOE #1, and JOHN DOE #2 are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. In reference to COUNTS 1, 2, 3, and 4 of the amended complaint, the Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants TREADWAY, STAFFORD, HARPER, STRUBHART, BURKE, MAUS and DARNOLD: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 5/29/2013. (tjk)
April 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add WARDEN HODGE as a Defendant in this action. Defendants LAWRENCE CORRECTIONAL CENTER, and the "Entire inmate population in custody" are DISMISSED f rom this action with prejudice. Plaintiff is HEREBY ORDERED to file a complaint with the Court, within 21 days. Plaintiff is FURTHER ORDERED to either pay the $350 filing fee for this action, or submit a motion for leave to proceed IFP, with in the same deadline. Failure to timely file a complaint, or to comply with the filing fee requirements herein, shall result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to complete, on Plaintiffs behalf, a summo ns and form USM-285 for service of process on Defendant HODGE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, within 14 days of the date of this Order, the United States Marshals Service SHALL personally serve upon Defendant HODGE. (Action due by 5/13/2013). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 4/22/2013. (tjk)
December 10, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 33 Report and Recommendations.; finding as moot 61 Motion ; Denying 1 Motion for TRO; Denying 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The deadlines contained in the Trial Practice Schedule (Doc. 41) remain in effect, and a jury trial remains set for June 2015. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/10/13. (dkd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Baird v. Hodge, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Darnold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Maus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Strubhart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Harper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treadway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Hodge
Represented By: Lisa A. Cook
Represented By: Robert L. Fanning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Baird
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]