Young v. Alton Mental Health Center et al

Defendant: Karen Klunk, Barbara Auston, Alton Mental Health Center and Anita Brazil
Plaintiff: LaVondas V. Young
Case Number: 3:2013cv00378
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: William D. Stiehl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Anita Brazil, Karen Klunk. Plaintiff failed to respond to the motion. Anita Brazil (Hospital Administrator) and Karen Klunk (Clinical Nursing Manager) are terminated from this action without prejudice.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/17/2014. (mtm)
May 19, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 49 Response filed by LaVondas V. Young. The Court again directs plaintiff to inform the Court as to the steps she has taken to serve the remaining named defendants on or before June 9, 2014. Failure to so inform the Court shall result in dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/19/2014. (mtm)
June 18, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for failure to prosecute, denying 52 motion to not dismiss.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/18/2014. (mtm)
May 10, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 3 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel, and 4 Motion for Service of Process at Government's Expense. Plaintiff must pay the Court's filing fee by June 10, 2013. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send plaintiff Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons and Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons) with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 5/10/2013. (bjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Alton Mental Health Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Klunk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Auston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton Mental Health Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Brazil
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaVondas V. Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]