Chapman v. USA

Petitioner: Rondale Lee Chapman
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2013cv00384
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/13/2013 10:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Defendant shall be allowed to particiapte by videoconfernece. Attorney Gary E. Milone, Sr for Rondale Lee Chapman added for the purpose of this hearing only. The Court further DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to add Milone as an attorney of record for Chapman in the underlying criminal case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/2/13. (jdh)
September 12, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re 13 The MOTION to Continue filed by Rondale Lee Chapman. Evidentiary Hearing reset for 11/1/2013 at 10:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. The Court is hereby granting 13 The MOTION to Continuefiled by Rondale Lee Chapman. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/12/2013. (kjr, )(Entered: 9/12/2013)
November 19, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Denying without prejudice 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Rondale Lee Chapman. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/19/13. (jdh)
March 4, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court reserves ruling on Chapman's implied request for a certificate of appealability until it issues its final order and judgment. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to the Court of Appeals in connection with Appeal No. 14-1407. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/4/2014. (jdh)
August 8, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DENIES Chapmans motion under 28 U.S.C § 2255 (Doc. 1 ); DENIES Chapmans motion for leave to amend his petition (Doc. 20 ); DENIES without prejudice Chapmans motion for free copies (Doc. 31 ); DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability; and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/8/2014. (jdh)
May 16, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court finds that Ground IIa does not justify § 2255 relief. The Court ORDERS the Government to file a response to the remainder of petitioners § 2255 motion. The Government shall, as part of its response, attach all relevant portions of the record in the underlying criminal case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/16/2013. (jdh)
September 16, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 41 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing Transcripts filed by Rondale Lee Chapman. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/16/2014. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 20, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DENIES Chapmans motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis (Doc. 45 ) and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to the Court of Appeals in conjunction with Appeal No. 14-2994. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/20/2014. (jdh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rondale Lee Chapman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: George A. Norwood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]