Anderson v. United State Department of Agriculture et al

Defendant: Illinois Department of Agriculture, United State Department of Agriculture and Farm Services Agency
Plaintiff: Mark Anderson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00672
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Williamson
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1986 Neglect of Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 18 MOTION for Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Mark Anderson and vacating the entry of default against the USDA at doc 20 . Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/29/2013. (jdh)
February 21, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court vacates the entry of default against the USDA and FSA (doc. 36 )and denies motions 30 MOTION for Entry of Default MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Mark Anderson and 33 MOTION for Entry of Default MOT ION for Default Judgment as to filed by Mark Anderson. The Court orders plaintiff Mark Anderson to show cause on or before 3/21/2014 why his failure to properly serve the USDA and FSA should not result in dismissal of his action against the USDA and FSA.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/21/2014. (jdh)
May 1, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DISMISSES without prejudice defendants USDA and FSA for Andersons failure to properly effectuate service with 120 days pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/1/2014. (jdh)
May 9, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 40 MOTION for Recusal filed by Mark Anderson. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/9/2014. (jdh)
May 19, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Illinois Department of Agriculture. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/19/2014. (jdh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. United State Department of Agriculture et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Karen L. McNaught
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State Department of Agriculture
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Services Agency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]