Buitron v. Holder et al

Respondent: Eric Holder and James Cross
Petitioner: Gabriel Buitron
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00974
Filed: September 20, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Bond
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, DENYING Habeas Corpus petition and GRANTING 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by James Cross, Eric Holder. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/10/14. (klh, )
February 10, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT granting respondent's motion and denying the Petition. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/10/2014. (slj)
March 14, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/14/14. (klh, )
October 30, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that respondents shall answer the petition or otherwise plead within thirty days of the date this order is entered. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 10/30/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Buitron v. Holder et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Holder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Cross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabriel Buitron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]