Bridges et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc et al

Plaintiff: Latunya Barlow, Barbara Lewis and Felecia Bridges
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare AG and Bayer AG
Case Number: 3:2013cv10544
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Granting 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution - Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice -- Plaintiff Latunya Barlow Only filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Latunya Barlow terminated.Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 11/25/2014. (dsw)
December 4, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution - Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice -- Plaintiff Barbara Lewis Only filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Barbara Lewis terminated. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 12/3/2014. (dsw)
July 17, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Latunya Barlow, 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Barbara Lewis. Attorney Michael K. Johnson terminated. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/17/2014. (kbl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latunya Barlow
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lewis
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felecia Bridges
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]