Lanese et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc et al

Plaintiff: Tinika Anderson-Oliver, Stephanie Jones, Sarah Lanese, Angela Barlow and Kelly Robertson
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare AG and Bayer AG
Case Number: 3:2013cv10577
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Kelly Robertson, 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Tinika Anderson-Oliver, 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Stephanie Jones, 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Angela Barlow. Attorney Michael K. Johnson terminated. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/17/2014. (kbl)
December 1, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Granting 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution - Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice -- Plaintiff Angela Barlow Only filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc and 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution - Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice -- Plaintiff Tinika Anderson-Oliver Only filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Tinika Anderson-Oliver and Angela Barlow terminated.Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 11/25/2014. (dsw)
December 4, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution - Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice -- Plaintiff Stephanie Jones Only 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution - Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice -- Plaintiff Kelly Robertson Only. Stephanie Jones and Kelly Robertson terminated.Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 12/3/2014. (dsw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanese et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tinika Anderson-Oliver
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Lanese
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Barlow
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Robertson
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]