The Triple-I Corporation v. Hudson Associates Consulting, Inc. et al

 
Case Number: 2:2006cv02195
Filed: May 12, 2006
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2008 226 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 206 the KMPro Affiliates and Kirschs motion to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/5/08. (mt)
May 1, 2009 382 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 328 Triple-I's Motion for Sanctions; granting 336 Knowledge Central and Dysvick's Motion to Amend Answer; granting 352 Triple-I's Motion for Protective Order; finding as moot 356 KMPro's Motio n to Strike Report; denying without prejudice 367 KMPro's Motion to Terminate Consolidation, Realign Parties and Establish Order of Trial; and granting 378 KMPro's Motion to Strike Unauthorized Pleadings. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 5/1/09. (sj)
May 1, 2009 383 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The motion to reconsider 291 of Dr. Morris is denied. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 5/1/09.(sj)
July 17, 2009 434 Featured Case ORDER denying 390 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge re 382 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Leave to File. The Magistrate Judge's Order is affirmed. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/17/2009. (cm)
July 17, 2009 435 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 355 Motion to Strike Affidavit of Robert Spachman ; denying 391 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts 2, 4 and 5; denying 330 Motion for Summary Judgment on Count III. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/17/2009. (cm)
May 17, 2010 477 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 408 Motion for Relief; granting 409 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 410 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 411 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/17/2010. (cm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: The Triple-I Corporation v. Hudson Associates Consulting, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]