Ed Tobergte Associates Company v. Bike Athletic Company

Plaintiff: Ed Tobergte Associates Company
Defendant: Bike Athletic Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv02290
Filed: June 26, 2008
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Ellis
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Referring Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 43 Ginnie Derusseau's Motion to Quash; and sustaining in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. The parties and Ms. Derusseau should confer for the purpose of sett ing a new date for her deposition, pursuant to the subpoena duces tecum previously served or one similar to it. At a time upon which the parties and Ms. Derusseau can agree or as otherwise designated by a subpoena, she shall produce the documents requested by Defendant, except for those identified by Plaintiffs privilege log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 8/3/2009. (byk)
November 5, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is ordered that certain terms in the patent at issue in this action are construed as set forth herein. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/05/2009.(ses)
November 19, 2008 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 11/19/2008. (byk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ed Tobergte Associates Company v. Bike Athletic Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Tobergte Associates Company
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bike Athletic Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.