Building Erection Services Company, L.C. v. American Buildings Company et al

Plaintiff: Building Erection Services Company, L.C.
Defendant: American Buildings Company
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv02104
Filed: March 2, 2009
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss; granting 83 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/29/10. (yh)
July 29, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 90 Motion for Order and denying 101 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 7/29/2010. (sr)
January 13, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/13/10. (mh)
January 13, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/13/10. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Building Erection Services Company, L.C. v. American Buildings Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Erection Services Company, L.C.
Represented By: Kurt S. Brack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Buildings Company
Represented By: Scott R. Ast
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]