Bennett v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Cora E. Bennett
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation, Gary D. Forsee, Paul N. Saleh and William G. Arendt
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv02122
Filed: March 10, 2009
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 87 Motion to Strike. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/29/2011. (cm)
March 25, 2013 185 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 172 Motion to Strike. Defendants shall have up to and including 5/31/2013 to file a surreply in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/25/2013. (cm)
March 27, 2014 221 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 116 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/27/2014. (cm)
January 6, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 1/6/2011. (cm)
February 23, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 65 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/23/2011. (cm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bennett v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora E. Bennett
Represented By: John J. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D. Forsee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul N. Saleh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Arendt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]