VRWC, L.L.C. v. AUMD, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: VRWC, L.L.C.
Defendant: AUMD, L.L.C., Cardmarte, Inc., Technicard, Inc., Alfred Urcuyo, Jr., Alfons Ciolek, Max K. Day and Marcio Baltondano, Tecnicard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02268
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Referring Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff must effect service of process on defendants AUMD, L.L.C.; Cardmarte, Inc.; Alfred Urcuyo, Jr.; Alfons Ciolek; and Max Day by December 14, 2009. Plaintiffs claims will be dismissed as to any defendant not served by that date. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/30/2009.(ses)
March 3, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT AUMD, L.L.C. - Plaintiffs claims against defendant AUMD, L.L.C. are hereby dismissed. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/03/2010.(ses)
March 4, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 44 defendant Cardmarte Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and plaintiffs entire action against the remaining defendants is hereby dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/04/2010. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VRWC, L.L.C. v. AUMD, L.L.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VRWC, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert W. Cotter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUMD, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardmarte, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technicard, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Urcuyo, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfons Ciolek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max K. Day
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcio Baltondano, Tecnicard, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]