Turney, Jr. et al v. Fifth Third Bank et al

Plaintiff: Frank Turney, Jr., Turney & Son, Inc., Frank J. Turney, Jr. Insurance Agency, Inc., Houston Agencies, Inc., Peggy Miser, Miser & Miser Associates, LP and Miser and Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, Dz Bank AG Deutsche Zentral-Genossenschaftsbank, Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Bayerische Hypo- And Vereisbank, AG, Arvest Bank Group, Inc., Arvest Bank Operations, Inc., NCMIC Finance Corporation and Aleritas Capital Corporation
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv02533
Filed: October 15, 2009
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 95 Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts Memorandum and Order of September 20, 2010; granting 100 defendant DZ Banks motion to dismiss the claim against it for breach of contract ; denying as moot 112 plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint.. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/17/2010. (ses)
April 12, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 141 defendant DZ Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment and summary judgment is entered on the remaining claim by plaintiffs against DZ Bank. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 4/12/2011. (ses)
April 29, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 47 defendant DZ Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants motions to dismiss plaintiffs second amended complaint (Doc. # 47 , 48 , 49 , 50 , 52 , and 57 ) are granted. Plaintiffs are granted leave to f ile a third amended complaint, on or before May 14, 2010, by which they may attempt to cure the pleading deficiencies noted herein. If plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint by that date, this action shall be dismissed. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/29/2010. (ses)
September 20, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Defendants' motions to dismiss plaintiffs' third party complaint 81 82 83 87 are granted in part and denied in part. The motions are granted with respect to Counts I through X of plaintiffs third amended compla int, and those claims are hereby dismissed. The motions are denied with respect to Count XI of plaintiffs third amended complaint. Plaintiffs are also granted leave to file a fourth amended complaint, on or before October 1, 2010, by which they may amend Count X to cure the pleading deficiencies noted herein. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/20/2010. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Turney, Jr. et al v. Fifth Third Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Turney, Jr.
Represented By: Robert M. Pitkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turney & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Pitkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank J. Turney, Jr. Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Pitkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Agencies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Pitkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Miser
Represented By: Robert M. Pitkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miser & Miser Associates, LP
Represented By: Robert M. Pitkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miser and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Pitkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dz Bank AG Deutsche Zentral-Genossenschaftsbank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayerische Hypo- And Vereisbank, AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvest Bank Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvest Bank Operations, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCMIC Finance Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleritas Capital Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]