Patel v. Reddy et al

Plaintiff: Kamal K. Patel
Defendant: T. K. Reddy, Ishwar Patel, Mitesh Patel, Shiva Hotels, Inc., David Snapp and Waite, Snapp & Doll Law Firm
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02403
Filed: July 20, 2010
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reaffirming the court's order 191 denying plaintiff K&A Motel, Inc.'s motion to compel 167 with respect to Interrogatory No. 23. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/19/2013. Mailed to pro se party Kamal K. Patel, Reg. No. 56496-080, BSCC-Flightline Unit, 2001 Rickabaugh Dr., Big Spring, TX 79720 by regular mail. (mb)
October 19, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and DENYING 21 Motion for Default Judgment. David Snapp answer due 10/27/2010. Waite, Snapp & Doll Law Firm answer due 10/27/2010. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/19/10. (alm)
October 1, 2013 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 322 plaintiff's motion to stay case. Because the pending motion to quash is specifically directed to plaintiff 336 , the deadline for plaintiff to respond is extended until October 22, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/1/2013. Mailed to pro se party Kamal Patel, No. 56496-080, CI Big Spring, 2001 Rickbaugh Drive, Big Spring, TX 79720 by regular mail. (mb)
October 23, 2013 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 348 350 352 without prejudice for failure to sufficiently confer in accordance with D. Kan. Rule 37.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/23/2013. Mailed to pro se party Kamal Patel, No. 56496-080, CI Big Spring, 2001 Rickbaugh Drive, Big Spring, TX 79720 by regular mail. (mb)
October 31, 2013 366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 336 337 motions to quash subpoenas issued by plaintiff and denying 362 plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file response. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/31/2013. Mailed to pro se party Kamal Patel, No. 56496-080, CI Big Spring, 2001 Rickbaugh Drive, Big Spring, TX 79720 by regular mail. (mb)
December 17, 2013 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 395 plaintiff's motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/17/2013. Mailed to pro se party Kamal Patel, No. 56496-080, CI Big Spring, 2001 Rickbaugh Dr., Big Spring, TX 79720 by regular mail. (mb)
December 30, 2013 403 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 402 Patel's Motion to Supplement; denying as moot 297 Patel's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and granting 316 Snapp's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 12/30/2013. Mailed to pro se party Kamal K. Patel by regular mail. (mss)
January 24, 2014 411 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 408 Patel's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/24/2014. Mailed to pro se party Kamal K. Patel by regular mail. (mss)
March 7, 2014 419 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 418 Patel's Motion for Extension of Time to March 19, 2014 to pay appeal filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/6/14. Mailed to pro se party Kamal K. Patel by regular mail. (mss)
February 23, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 48 defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 56 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Engage in Discovery; granting 61 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; grant ing 63 plaintiff's Motion to Stay Deadlines; and granting 66 plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss defendants T.K. Reddy and Ishwar Patel without prejudice. PLEASE REFER TO THE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT FILING DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/22/2012. (mss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Patel v. Reddy et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamal K. Patel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. K. Reddy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ishwar Patel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitesh Patel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiva Hotels, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Snapp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waite, Snapp & Doll Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]