First Media Insurance Specialists, Inc. et al v. OneBeacon Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: First Media Insurance Specialists, Inc., J. Lawrence Worrall, Jr. and Tracy Michelle Tilton
Defendant: OneBeacon Insurance Company, OneBeacon Professional Insurance, Inc., Matthew P. Dolan, Randall G. Oates, Joshua O. Stein and Tammi B. Dulberger
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02501
Filed: September 16, 2010
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 119 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of re cord. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel; granting 121 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category, The cle rk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel ; 120 stricken from the record. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/10/2014. (cm)
August 29, 2014 160 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 107 Motion for Hearing. Hearing was held on 8/20/2014. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/29/2014. (cm)
November 16, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or for a More Definite Statement. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/16/2011. (cm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: First Media Insurance Specialists, Inc. et al v. OneBeacon Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Media Insurance Specialists, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Lieber, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Lawrence Worrall, Jr.
Represented By: James C. Lieber, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Michelle Tilton
Represented By: James C. Lieber, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Professional Insurance, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew P. Dolan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall G. Oates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua O. Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammi B. Dulberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]