Farmers Bank & Trust, N.A. v. Witthuhn et al

Plaintiff: Farmers Bank & Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Ray L. Witthuhn, Brent Kerr and Tonetta Stieben
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02011
Filed: January 7, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Barton
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 95 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint attached to Doc. 95 within fourteen days. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 11/28/2011. (pp)
April 22, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 29 Motion to Modify the Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/22/2011. (pp)
June 7, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 6/7/2011. (mh)
October 13, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 42 Motion to Dismiss State Law Claims ; denying 65 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended motion for leave to amend, attaching a revised proposed amended complaint that complies with this Memorandum and Order by no later than October 24, 2011. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/13/2011. (pp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Farmers Bank & Trust, N.A. v. Witthuhn et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Bank & Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Lara K. Pabst
Represented By: David M. Kight
Represented By: Brian Christensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray L. Witthuhn
Represented By: Joseph R. Colantuono
Represented By: Katherine A. Worthington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Kerr
Represented By: Joseph R. Colantuono
Represented By: Katherine A. Worthington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonetta Stieben
Represented By: Joseph R. Colantuono
Represented By: Katherine A. Worthington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]