Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kovzan

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Stephen M. Kovzan
Case Number: 2:2011cv02017
Filed: January 12, 2011
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Referring Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 96 Defendant's Motion for Review of part of the Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order of July 31, 2012, is granted; the Court sets aside that portion of the Magistrate Judge's Order, and defendant's mot ion to compel is granted with respect to the documents discussed herein. Plaintiff SEC shall produce the requested documents in accordance with this Order on or before November 9, 2012.. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/10/2012. (ses)
February 21, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 137 Motion to Compel. Within thirty (30) calendar days from the date of this order, the SEC shall fully respond, without objection, to Mr. Kovzan's Second Set of Requests for Admission (ECF No. 140-2) and to Mr. Kovzan's Third Set of Requests for Production (ECF No. 140-3). Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 2/21/2013.
February 21, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 143 Motion to Quash; granting 165 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Within the next fourteen (14) days, the parties shall confer about a mutually agreeable time, date, and place for the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of the SEC. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 2/21/2013.
October 15, 2013 289 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 217 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Plaintiffs motion is granted with respect to defendants vagueness defense; plaintiffs motion is otherwise denied; and granting in part and denying in part 224 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment - Defendants motion is granted to the extent that certain of plaintiffs claims are time-barred, and it is awarded judgment on those claims, as set forth herein; defendants motion is otherwise denied.. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/15/2013. (ses)
August 4, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. The motion is granted with respect to Counts One, Two, Three, Four, and Nine to the extent they are based on the conduct alleged in Paragraph 50 of the amended complaint, and with respect to Count Six to the extent it is based on the conduct alleged in Paragraphs 55(b), 56(c), and 57 of the amended complaint; and those claims are hereby dismissed. The motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/4/2011. (ses)
July 31, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion to Compel. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, the SEC shall supplement its response to Interrogatory No. 1 and to Request for Production Nos. 67-72, as limited in this order. The SEC must also identify by Bates number those documents that are responsive to each individual request contained in Request Nos. 74-82. Mr. Kovzan's motion to compel, as it pertains to documents appearing on the SEC's priv ilege log, is denied without prejudice to refiling within thirty (30) calendar days from the date of this order should such a motion become necessary after the parties meaningfully confer. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 7/31/2012.(bh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kovzan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Helaine Schwartz
Represented By: David Frohlich
Represented By: Jeffrey Tao
Represented By: David Williams
Represented By: Erica Y. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Kovzan
Represented By: F.G. Maxwell Carr-Howard
Represented By: Lyndsey J. Conrad
Represented By: Stephen L. Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole R. Rabner
Represented By: Andrew B. Weissman
Represented By: Christopher A. Wilber
Represented By: J. David Zetlin-Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]