Dealer Computer Services, Inc. v. Griffith

Plaintiff: Dealer Computer Services, Inc.
Defendant: Roland Griffith
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02305
Filed: June 1, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 95 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/13/2012. (ses)
January 26, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Defendant shall file an amended answer consistent with this ruling on or before 2/3/2012. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 1/25/2012. (sj)
August 3, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 8/3/2012. (sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dealer Computer Services, Inc. v. Griffith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dealer Computer Services, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Coghlan
Represented By: Sarah E. Millin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Griffith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]