W&W Steel, LLC v. BSC Steel, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: W&W Steel, LLC
Defendant: BSC Steel, Inc. and Jay Patel
Case Number: 2:2011cv02613
Filed: November 8, 2011
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Rogers
Referring Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice to refiling 40 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Within seven (7) calendar days from the date of this order, BSC may file an amended complaint that omits the fraudulent misrepresentation claim, or BSC may file a renewed motion for leave to amend its pleading to assert a properly pled fraudulent misrepresentation claim. Any amended pleading or proposed amended pleading shall remedy the procedural deficiency described in the Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 5/18/2012. (bh)
May 2, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 48 Motion to Intervene and granting 64 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/1/2013. (ms)
May 9, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Dismiss by counterclaim defendant W&W Steel, LLC and third-party defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. The following counts of BSC Steel, LLC's second amended coun terclaim and third-party complaint are hereby dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted: Count II, Count VIII, Count IX and Count XI. The Motion to Dismiss 66 is granted in part and denied in part. The following count of BSC Steel, LLC's third-party complaint is hereby dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted: Count VIII, Count IX and Count XI. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/9/2013. (ms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W&W Steel, LLC v. BSC Steel, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W&W Steel, LLC
Represented By: John M. McFarland
Represented By: Erin R. McClernon
Represented By: Scott E. Harvison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSC Steel, Inc.
Represented By: G. Steven Ruprecht
Represented By: Heather F. Shore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Patel
Represented By: G. Steven Ruprecht
Represented By: Heather F. Shore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]