Heartland Animal Clinic, P.A. v. Heartland SPCA Animal Medical Center, LLC et al

Defendant: Heartland Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals, Inc., Heartland SPCA Pet Adoption and Lost Pet Center, LLC and Heartland SPCA Animal Medical Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Heartland Animal Clinic, P.A.
Case Number: 2:2011cv02629
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/20/2012. (mss)
March 30, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 54 defendants' Motion for Stay of Execution. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/30/2012. (mss)
April 24, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 63 plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4/24/2012. (mss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heartland Animal Clinic, P.A. v. Heartland SPCA Animal Medical Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler J. Scott
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland SPCA Pet Adoption and Lost Pet Center, LLC
Represented By: Tyler J. Scott
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland SPCA Animal Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Simon
Represented By: Tyler J. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Animal Clinic, P.A.
Represented By: Christopher Marshall McHugh
Represented By: Bradley R. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.