Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Cox Communications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company, LP
Defendant: Cox Communications, Inc. and Cox Communications Kansas, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv02683
Filed: December 19, 2011
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/18/2012. (pp)
July 6, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Plaintiff's request for jurisdictional discovery is granted; limited jurisdictional discovery shall be completed by 8/3/12. Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/9/2012 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Julie A. Robinson - Regarding CCI's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/6/2012. (mb)
September 14, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that Defendant Cox Communications Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Doc. 31) is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that the Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Doc. 33) is granted. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Cox Communications, Inc. and Cox Communications Kansas, LLC's motions to dismiss the original complaint (Docs. 18 and 20) are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/14/2012. (pp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Cox Communications, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company, LP
Represented By: Adam P. Seitz
Represented By: Jason R. Mudd
Represented By: Eric A. Buresh
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications Kansas, LLC
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]