Hull et al v. Viega, Inc.

Defendant: Viega GMBH & CO.KG, Viega International GMBH, VG Pipe, LLC, Viega, Inc., Viega, LLC, Vanguard Industries, Inc. and Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jimmy Hull, Regina Hull, Gilbert Meyer, Dorothy O'Brien and Daniel Tessier
Case Number: 2:2012cv02086
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER.The Court finds that Plaintiffs have shown good cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to Defendant Vanguard Industries, Inc. Furthermore, the Court finds that Plaintiffs' service on the Kansas version of Vanguard Industries, Inc., shall be deemed timely. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/19/2012. (pp)
February 27, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 43 Defendant Vanguard Industries, Inc.'s Motion for Joinder; denying as moot 44 Defendant Vanguard Industries, Inc.'s Motion to file out of time; denying without prejudice to renew within thirty (30) days of this Order 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike class action allegations. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 2/27/2013. (pp)
October 29, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE: all matters and claims against Defendants are stayed pending further order of the court. Plaintiff's shall file a status report due by 12/12/2013 notifying the court of the outcome of the December 2, 2013 Fairness Hearing in Verdejo. 72 MOTION for Leave to file supplemental brief filed by Daniel Tessier, Jimmy Hull, Dorothy O'Brien, Gilbert Meyer, Regina Hull is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/28/2013. (daw)
March 6, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss; granting 60 Motion to Amend Complaint. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/6/14. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hull et al v. Viega, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega GMBH & CO.KG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega International GMBH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VG Pipe, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Hull
Represented By: Joseph A. Kronawitter
Represented By: Robert A. Horn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Hull
Represented By: Joseph A. Kronawitter
Represented By: Robert A. Horn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Meyer
Represented By: Robert A. Horn
Represented By: Joseph A. Kronawitter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy O'Brien
Represented By: Robert A. Horn
Represented By: Joseph A. Kronawitter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Tessier
Represented By: Robert A. Horn
Represented By: Joseph A. Kronawitter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]