Olathe-Santa Fe Partnership et al v. Doull et al

Plaintiff: Olathe-Santa Fe Partnership, Village Properties, Inc., Tony R. Plunkett, Charles A. White, James J. Green, Pyramid Realty Association and Jeff Wyler, Inc.
Defendant: John K. Doull, Nancy A. Taylor, John V. Doull, Thomas Debacco, Kent Whittaker, Brad Harvey, Michael N. McDaniel and Cornerstone Bank
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02374
Filed: June 14, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Referring Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response deadline 10/25/2012. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/18/2012. (mem)
April 22, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part separate defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss. The court dismisses plaintiffs' RICO claim. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs' remaining state law claims and dism isses those claims without prejudice. The court denies the remainder of defendants' motion as moot and without prejudice. Further, granting in part defendant Kent Whittaker's 16 Motion to Dismiss Party. The court dismisses plaintiffs' ; RICO claim. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs' remaining state law claims and dismisses those claims without prejudice. The court denies the remainder of defendants' motion as moot and without prejudice. Further, plaintiffs' request for leave to amend is denied. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/19/2013. (mg)
July 29, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 51 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 7/29/2013. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Olathe-Santa Fe Partnership et al v. Doull et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olathe-Santa Fe Partnership
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony R. Plunkett
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. White
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Green
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pyramid Realty Association
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Wyler, Inc.
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Doull
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V. Doull
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Debacco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Whittaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Harvey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael N. McDaniel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]