American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Robert Harris and Mandy Harris
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., OWT Industries, Inc. and Techtronic Industries Factory Outlets, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02609
Filed: September 14, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 68 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. ; overruling 84 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before March 25, 2014, defendant may file an unsealed Exhibit P to defendants' M emorandum In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment (Doc. #63) filed October 25, 2013 and an unsealed Exhibit E to Defendants' Motion To Strike Or Disregard The Declaration Of Jennifer Chick, CPA, And Supporting Memorandum (Doc. #83) filed December 13, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/20/14. (hw)
May 15, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 89 Motion to Identify a rebuttal witness. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court sets the following deadlines: On or beforeMay 22, 2014, defendants may depose Jennifer Chick, C.P.A. On or before May 29, 2014, defendants may disclose an expert to rebut Chick's testimony. On or before June 5, 2014, plaintiffs may depose any rebuttal expert disclosed by defendant. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 5/15/14. (hw)
May 16, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining in part Defendants' 62 Motion For Summary Judgment; overruling as moot Plaintiffs' 60 Motion For Summary Judgment On Defendants' Fourth Affirmative Defense; overruling Defendants' 86 Motion to Strike Or Disregard the Declaration Of Plaintiff Robert Harris; and overruling as moot Defendants' 83 Motion To Strike Or Disregard theDeclaration Of Jennifer Chick, CPA. The Court grants summary judgment in favor of defendants on plaintiffs& #039; claims that defendants manufactured, distributed and/or sold a product which was unreasonably dangerous due to defects in its design and/or defects in its manufacture. Plaintiffs' remaining claim is that defendants manufactured, distributed and/or sold a product which was unreasonably dangerous due to inadequate warnings. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 05/16/2014. (mg)
May 27, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 61 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Nathan Dorris; sustaining 65 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael Wogalter, Ph.D. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 05/27/14. (ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin D. Wait
Represented By: Frank W. Lipsman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Harris
Represented By: Floyd R. Finch, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Harris
Represented By: Floyd R. Finch, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Katz
Represented By: Christopher L. Heigele
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWT Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Heigele
Represented By: Mark D. Katz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries Factory Outlets, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Heigele
Represented By: Mark D. Katz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]