H&L Associates of Kansas City, LLC v. Midwestern Indemnity Company, The

Plaintiff: H&L Associates of Kansas City, LLC
Defendant: Midwestern Indemnity Company, The
Case Number: 2:2012cv02713
Filed: November 7, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/25/2013. (cm)
October 25, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, Defendant must: (1) Serve a fully responsive answer to Interrogatory No. 2 by providing all t he information requested by the interrogatory, including the full name of all individuals with knowledge, their employer's name, job title, contact information, and general description of the nature of each person's knowledge; (2) Provide a n amended privilege log with respect to pages identified as H&L 000000037 through 000000224 (the last eight entries on the privilege log); (3) Produce manuals, procedures, guidelines, and other similar documents during the last three years responsive to Request Nos. 13-16; (4) Produce claim files for the five oldest and five newest claims in Kansas and Missouri responsive Request Nos. 18 and 19; and (5) Produce documents it agreed to produce as responsive to Request Nos. 20, 28, and 31. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/25/2013. (byk)
November 1, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery. The motion is granted as to Second Request Nos. 47, 58-60, 62, and 65; granted in part as to Request No. 63; and denied as to Request Nos. 61 and 64. Within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff must: (1) Produce roof condition correspondence, inspection and repair records for the 15-year time period requested, responsive to Request Nos. 47, 58-60; (2) Produce docu ments (other than its state and federal tax returns) sufficient to identify the entity or person that prepared its tax returns for 2008 to the present, responsive to Request No. 62; (3) Produce its January through April 2012 bank statements, responsi ve to Request No. 63; and (4) Produce documents sufficient to identify the entity or person who maintained its accounting records from 2010 through 2013, responsive to Request No. 65. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/1/2013. (byk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&L Associates of Kansas City, LLC v. Midwestern Indemnity Company, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&L Associates of Kansas City, LLC
Represented By: Christopher S. Shank
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwestern Indemnity Company, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]