Paliwoda v. Showman

Plaintiff: Jacob Paliwoda
Defendant: Jason Showman
Case Number: 2:2012cv02740
Filed: November 21, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Rogers
Referring Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 7/15/2013. (mrb)
November 6, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 44 Motion to Strike. See attached order for details. The parties shall comply with the court's previous order (ECF No. 54) and jointly submit an amended scheduling order with proposed deadlines for all remaining discovery deadlines within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 11/6/2013. (mrb)
August 12, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Opinions 13, 14, and 15 of Dr. Taylor's fourth revised expert report are hereby stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 8/12/2014. (mrb)
August 12, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 72 Plaintiff's Motion to Limit Defendant's Expert Designations. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 8/12/2014. (mrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paliwoda v. Showman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Paliwoda
Represented By: James R. Shetlar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Showman
Represented By: Tracie R. England
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]