Ross v. Rothstein

Plaintiff: Stanton E. Ross
Defendant: Adam Rothstein
Counter_claimant: Adam Rothstein
Counter_defendant: Stanton E. Ross
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02101
Filed: February 25, 2013
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2014 201 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 125 defendant/counter claimant Adam Rothstein's Motion for Review; granting 132 Mr. Rothstein's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 159 Mr. Ross's Motion for Reconsideration ; and denying 185 Mr. Rothstein's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/09/2014. (ses)
May 30, 2014 240 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 208 plaintiff Stanton E. Ross's motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(h) for order striking declaration of Stephen Gans. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/30/2014. (ses)
June 2, 2014 242 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC denying 208 Motion for Order Striking Declaration of Stephen Gans. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 6/2/14. (mm)
July 19, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying plaintiff/counterclaim defendant Mr. Rosss motion for order permitting the deposit into court of Infinity Energy Resource, Inc. Certificate No. 3278 representing 77,310 shares of Infinitys common stock 24 . IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT Mr. Ross, no later than August 5, 2013, shall issue such instructions, make such requests and take such actions within his power, competence and authority to cause Infinitys stock transfer agent to reissue Infinity Energy Resource, Inc. Certificate No. 3278 without the restrictive legend. Thereafter, Mr. Ross shall promptly, and no later than Friday, August 9, 2013, move the court for permission to deposit that certificate with the court. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 7/19/2013. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ross v. Rothstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanton E. Ross
Represented By: Adam J. Gasper
Represented By: James F.B. Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Rothstein
Represented By: Sharon A. Stallbaumer
Represented By: Neil L. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Adam Rothstein
Represented By: Neil L. Johnson
Represented By: Sharon A. Stallbaumer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Stanton E. Ross
Represented By: James F.B. Daniels
Represented By: Adam J. Gasper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]