Stonebarger et al v. Union Pacific Corporation

Plaintiff: Therman Turner, Jr., Ruth Turner and Melissa Stonebarger
Defendant: Union Pacific Corporation
Case Number: 2:2013cv02137
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 104 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/16/2014. (ts)
November 6, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 115 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Additional Discovery; denying 131 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/6/2014. (ts)
July 2, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 42 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery as modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 07/02/2014. (ts)
July 21, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 43 Motion to Compel. Union Pacific shall provide to Plaintiffs a privilege log which provides sufficient information to allow Plaintiffs to assess the claimed privileges within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Union Pacific shall provide to Plaintiff those documents not claimed as privileged which are responsive to Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production of Documents Numbers 41 (as modified and limited to the five (5) years preceding the date of the accident at issue), 63, 64, and 67 (as modified and limited to all Accident Investigation Guideline manuals in effect from the beginning of Michael Nelson's tenure as CEO of Union Pacific until the 7/11/20014, New York Times article) and further subject to limitations previously agreed to by the parties, within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/21/2014. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stonebarger et al v. Union Pacific Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therman Turner, Jr.
Represented By: George H. Pearson, III
Represented By: Richard Reagan Sahadi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Turner
Represented By: Richard Reagan Sahadi
Represented By: George H. Pearson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Stonebarger
Represented By: Richard Reagan Sahadi
Represented By: George H. Pearson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]