Lain v. Johnson County Community College Foundation, Inc. et al

Defendant: Johnson County Community College and BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Lee Lain
Case Number: 2:2013cv02201
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 9 defendant Johnson County Community College's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/12/2013. (ses)
October 3, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying defendant BNSF Railway Company's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/03/2014. (mg)
November 14, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 defendant BNSF Railway Company's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Frank Burg. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/14/2014. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lain v. Johnson County Community College Foundation, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County Community College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Lain
Represented By: Richard B. Hankins(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Patrick J. Harrington(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kenneth J. Sophie, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]