Helget v. Hays, Kansas, City of et al

Defendant: Toby Dougherty, Hays, Kansas, City of and Donald E. Scheibler
Plaintiff: Firma Helget
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02228
Filed: May 15, 2013
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Ellis
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 36 Motion to Produce Documents Listed in Privilege Log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/28/14. (df)
March 31, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 50 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Compel Defendants to Initiate a Litigation Hold, for Preliminary Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence and for Leave to Conduct Supplemental Discovery on Spoliation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/31/14. (df)
June 24, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 119 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/24/14. (df)
June 25, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/25/14. (df)
March 19, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/19/14. (df)
July 31, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 5 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/31/2013. (df)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Helget v. Hays, Kansas, City of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Dougherty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hays, Kansas, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Scheibler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firma Helget
Represented By: Christopher J. Stucky(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Eric S. Playter(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joseph M. McGreevy(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Steve A.J. Bukaty(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Donald R. Aubry(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]