Hose v. Henry Industries, Inc.

Defendant: Henry Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Hose
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02490
Filed: September 18, 2013
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
 
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 32 plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4/7/14. (mss)
June 11, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 47 defendant's Motion to Strike. Defendant's response to plaintiffs' motion to certify class shall be filed on or before June 27, 2014. Plaintiffs' reply may be filed on or before July 11, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 6/11/14. (mss)
September 24, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 42 plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 9/24/14. (mss)
October 31, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 58 defendant's Motion to Clarify or Reconsider. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/31/14. (mss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hose v. Henry Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie N. Scheck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hose
Represented By: Cyrus Dashtaki(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]