Baynham v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Tyrone La-Mar Baynham
Case Number: 2:2014cv02053
Filed: February 6, 2014
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: MOTION to Dismiss 12 will be treated as a motion for summary judgment. Defendant shall file record no later than 7/1/14. Within 21 days of the filing of the record, plaintiff will file a brief on the issue of whether equitable tolling of the statute of limitations is justified. Defendant shall file a response within 21 days of the filing of the plaintiff's brief. See order for further details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 5/30/14. Mailed to pro se party Tyrone La-Mar Baynham by regular & certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7010 2780 0003 1927 1619. (mb)
December 3, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 15 Motion to Transfer Case. Plaintiff will file their brief no later than January 15, 2015. See order for further deadlines. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/3/14. Mailed to pro se party Tyrone La-Mar Baynham by regular and certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7010 2780 0003 1927 2371. (msb)
February 11, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 2/11/2014. Mailed to pro se party Tyrone La-Mar Baynham by regular mail. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baynham v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone La-Mar Baynham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]